MD HB48 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Shetty, R. Jones and Thiam)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Shetty, R. Jones and Thiam)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain exception authorizing, under certain circumstances, a student who is a registered sex offender to enter onto real property used for public or nonpublic elementary or secondary education; requiring a student who is a registered sex offender to continue receiving an education in accordance with State law in a locale other than real property used for public or nonpublic education; requiring a county board of education and the State Board of Education to develop certain guidelines and policies; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure – Registered Sex Offenders – Entry Onto School Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Shetty, R. Jones and Thiam) |
2021-04-09 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2021-04-09 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {228477/1 Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-26 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted |
2021-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {272719/1 Adopted |
2021-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-15 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-09-02 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB515 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Subjects
Counties
Criminal Law - Procedure
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Emergency Bills
Health, Department of
Juvenile Causes
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Safety
Public Schools
Remote and Hybrid Education
Sexual Offenses
Students
Criminal Law - Procedure
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Emergency Bills
Health, Department of
Juvenile Causes
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Safety
Public Schools
Remote and Hybrid Education
Sexual Offenses
Students
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 722 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |