MD HB494 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision of law authorizing a District Court commissioner to set bond or commit persons to jail in default of bond or release them on personal recognizance if circumstances warrant; authorizing a police officer to charge by citation for an offense that may be charged by summons under a specified provision of law under specified circumstances; requiring a police officer to submit a specified statement of charges, serve a statement and summons, and release the defendant under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsors
Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. David Moon [D] |
Del. Joseph Vallario [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-48) (Y: 87 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (87-48) |
2015-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {552812/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Abduction
Arrests
Assault
Bail
Circuit Courts
Citations
Clerks of Court
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Diseases
District Courts
Forms
Hearings
Home Detention
Law Enforcement
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Parole and Probation
Pretrial Detention or Release
Protection Orders
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Summonses
Sunset
Telephones
Vandalism
Victims
Arrests
Assault
Bail
Circuit Courts
Citations
Clerks of Court
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Diseases
District Courts
Forms
Hearings
Home Detention
Law Enforcement
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Parole and Probation
Pretrial Detention or Release
Protection Orders
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Summonses
Sunset
Telephones
Vandalism
Victims