MD HB494 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that a person who drives 20 miles per hour or more above the maximum speed limit is guilty of reckless driving; and establishing that a person charged with reckless driving must appear in court and may not prepay the fine.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving - Excessive Speeding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB337 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Subjects
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Crimes and Punishments
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 901.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |