MD HB510 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending and altering the Sustainable Communities Tax Credit Program; providing for a tax credit for the rehabilitation of small commercial properties under specified circumstances; prohibiting the Director of the Maryland Historical Trust from issuing tax credit certificates for small commercial properties under specified circumstances; repealing a tax credit for qualified rehabilitated structures; altering the tax credit for high performance buildings; etc.
Title
Sustainable Communities Tax Credit Program - Extension and Alteration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-20) (Y: 111 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-20) (Y: 111 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601 |
2014-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (111-20) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {185467/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Commerce and Business
Commercial Rehabilitation
Construction
Energy Matters
Fees
Historical Matters
Housing
Notices
Planning, Department of
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Smart Growth
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Zoning and Planning
Appropriations
Commerce and Business
Commercial Rehabilitation
Construction
Energy Matters
Fees
Historical Matters
Housing
Notices
Planning, Department of
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Smart Growth
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Zoning and Planning