MD HB516 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a utility company to give specified written notice to specified customers prior to deploying smart meters throughout all or a portion of the utility company's service territory; prohibiting a utility company from imposing any additional fee or charge on a specified customer who refuses installation of a smart meter or requests removal of a smart meter; requiring the Public Service Commission and the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to make specified reports regarding smart meters; etc.
Title
Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required Reports
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-24 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Energy Matters
Equipment
Fees
Fuel
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Notices
Public Health
Public Service Commission
Reports
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Energy Matters
Equipment
Fees
Fuel
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Notices
Public Health
Public Service Commission
Reports
Utilities
Utility Regulation