MD HB516 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-08 - Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Washington) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-08 - Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Washington) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the duties of the St. Mary's County Human Relations Commission with regard to encouraging and ensuring the equal treatment of all people within the community.
Title
St. Mary's County Human Relations Commission - Equal Treatment
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Washington) Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {213228/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
Discrimination
Gender
Local Government Mandates
Sexual Orientation
St. Mary's County
Counties - Local Laws
Discrimination
Gender
Local Government Mandates
Sexual Orientation
St. Mary's County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 29 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 29 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |