MD HB522 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB914
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to study certain matters relating to the Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students and make recommendations regarding any statutory or regulatory changes to the program; requiring, by December 31, 2020, the Department to submit its findings and recommendations to the Governor, the State Board of Education, and the General Assembly; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2021.
Title
Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB522 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
SB572 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
SB572 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Counselors
Education
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Special Education
Students
Teachers
Education
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Special Education
Students
Teachers
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0522?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0522f.pdf |