MD HB531 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extending through fiscal year 2028 the requirement that the Governor include a certain amount in the State budget for increasing the number of green schools in the State; and extending through calendar year 2029 the annual evaluation of the impact of the funds appropriated under the Act on increasing the number of green schools in the State.
Title
Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant - Funding and Evaluation - Extension
Sponsors
Del. Jazz Lewis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-6) |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB383 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 524
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Education
Environmental Health
Governor
Primary and Secondary Education
Renewable Energy Sources
Time
Weights and Measures
Budgets
Education
Environmental Health
Governor
Primary and Secondary Education
Renewable Energy Sources
Time
Weights and Measures