MD HB535 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating in Cecil County a Class EF (entertainment facility) beer, wine and liquor license; authorizing a license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor, from one or more outlets in an entertainment facility, for consumption anywhere in the entertainment facility only; requiring a facility for which a license is issued to have at least $35,000,000 in capital investment; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue one or more licenses for the same facility; etc.
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Facility License
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-26 | Hearing 4/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-19 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-02 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Cecil County
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Cecil County
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of