MD HB545 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Task Force to Study the Impact of Assault Weapons; providing for the membership, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2013; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of Assault Weapons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn |
2013-02-28 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m. |
2013-02-26 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-30 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Guns
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Weapons
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Guns
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Weapons