MD HB571 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-4)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-4)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Linked Deposit Program for Small Businesses in the Department of Housing and Community Development for a specified purpose; providing that specified loans qualify under the Program; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to confirm with the Department of General Services that specified loans are made to specified businesses; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to establish procedures for a specified notification; etc.
Title
Linked Deposit Program for Small Businesses - Lend Local Act of 2012
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Finance | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Third Reading Passed (131-6) | |
2012-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments 883592/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-09 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-07 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Banks and Trust Companies
Fees
Financial Institutions
General Services, Department of
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Interest
Investments
Liability
Loans
Notices
Procurement
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Savings and Loan Associations
Small Business
Treasurers
Fees
Financial Institutions
General Services, Department of
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Interest
Investments
Liability
Loans
Notices
Procurement
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Savings and Loan Associations
Small Business
Treasurers