MD HB571 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Public Service Commission, when determining specified expenses while setting a just and reasonable rate for a gas company, to include all costs reasonably incurred by the gas company for performing environmental remediation of real property in response to a State or federal law, regulation, or order under specified conditions; authorizing that specified environmental remediation costs be included in a gas company's specified expenses regardless of specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Madaleno) {493727/1 Adopted (28-18) (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-36) (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-36) (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {463625/1 Adopted |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {493727/1 Adopted (28-18) |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {827773/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {827773/1 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {827773/1 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2016-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-36) |
2016-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {623898/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-09 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Fuel
Prices
Public Service Commission
Public Works
Real Property
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Environmental Matters
Fuel
Prices
Public Service Commission
Public Works
Real Property
Utilities
Utility Regulation