MD HB576 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Local Stock Market and Social Stock Exchange Task Force; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding the feasibility of establishing an investment stock market or social stock exchange to the Governor and General Assembly on or before October 1, 2016; etc.
Title
Maryland Local Stock Market and Social Stock Exchange Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2015-02-24 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-12 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Corporations and Associations
Investments
Reports
Securities
Sunset
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Corporations and Associations
Investments
Reports
Securities
Sunset