MD HB580 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making specified provisions of law related to discrimination by a place of public accommodation applicable to the Internet Web site of a specified business entity; authorizing the remedy for discrimination by a place of public accommodation to include compensatory damages; authorizing specified persons to elect a civil action when a complaint filed with the Commission on Human Relations alleges discrimination by a place of public accommodation; etc.
Title
State Government - Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing, Employment, and
Sponsors
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] | Del. Donald Elliott [R] | Del. William Frank [R] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] |
Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn | |
2011-03-04 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-04 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-09 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Blind Persons
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Damages
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Discrimination
Electronic Commerce
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Human Relations Commission
Restaurants
Stadiums
Theaters
Transportation
Work, Labor and Employment
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Damages
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Discrimination
Electronic Commerce
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Human Relations Commission
Restaurants
Stadiums
Theaters
Transportation
Work, Labor and Employment
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB0580.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb0580f.pdf |