MD HB585 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-4)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-4)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from knowingly and willfully making a threat to harm an election official or an immediate family member of an election official because of the election official's role in administering the election process; and establishing that a person who violates the Act is guilty of a misdemeanor and on conviction is subject to imprisonment not exceeding 3 years or a fine not exceeding $2,500 or both.
Title
Protecting Election Officials Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 109 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 109 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 109 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21 |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (109-26) |
2024-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {593126/1 Adopted |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (109-25) |
2024-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {403627/1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB480 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Electronic Communication
Emergency Bills
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Threats
Work, Labor, and Employment
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Electronic Communication
Emergency Bills
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Threats
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 16 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |