MD HB597 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering from 7 to 10 days the time in which a mile thoroughbred racetrack licensee shall pay to the State Racing Commission the State tax imposed on the gross amount, less refunds, of money bet at the track for each racing day; authorizing a licensee at Pimlico Race Course to conduct live racing of Arabian breed horses under specified circumstances; altering from 3 to 10 days the time in which a mile thoroughbred racetrack licensee that operates a sending track shall pay money to the Commission; etc.
Title
Horse Racing - Mile Thoroughbred Racetracks - Payment of Taxes and Impact Aid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments 307274/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Finance | |
2012-04-01 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-04-01 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (131-0) | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments 625465/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-16 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading Ways and Means |