MD HB597 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-7)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 709
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-7)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 709
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the Law Enforcement Cadet Apprenticeship Program in the Maryland Department of Labor to be the Public Safety Apprenticeship Program; expanding the purpose and scope of the Program to promote careers with certain public safety agencies; altering the eligibility criteria and the types of grants to be awarded under the Program; requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to develop certain mental health wellness policies to be implemented in certain law enforcement agencies and correctional facilities; etc.
Title
Growing Apprenticeships and the Public Safety Workforce (GAPS) Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 709 |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {163324/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB470 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 708
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Apprentices
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Institutions
Correctional Officers
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Grants
Labor, Department of
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
Recruitment and Hiring
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
studies
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Apprentices
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Institutions
Correctional Officers
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Grants
Labor, Department of
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
Recruitment and Hiring
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
studies
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 11 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |