MD HB60 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "electric personal assistive mobility device" to require that the device have one vertical or center control bar or mechanism that responds to pressure from the hands or legs of the rider to steer the device and have a nonarticulating platform on which the rider stands.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-01-25 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-11-14 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous