MD HB606 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that, at the end of 2 years or 3 growing seasons, unused money in a local forest conservation fund be returned to the person who provided the money for specified tree planting purposes.
Title
Natural Resources - Local Forest Conservation Funds - Use of Money
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Del. Robert Costa [R] | Del. Ronald George [R] | Del. James King [R] |
Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] | Del. Mary Love [D] | Del. Tony McConkey [R] | Del. Steven Schuh [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-03-21 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-21 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading Environmental Matters |