MD HB606 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain gas and electric utilities to adopt a limited-income mechanism to benefit certain eligible limited-income customers, subject to the approval of the Public Service Commission; expanding the electric universal service program to customers who are at least 67 years old with annual incomes at or below 200% of the federal poverty level; establishing a Workgroup on Low-Income Utility Assistance to examine the forms of federal, State, local, and private assistance available to low-income residential energy customers; etc.
Title
Electricity and Gas - Limited-Income Mechanisms and Assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 638 |
2021-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-42) |
2021-04-10 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {617676/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-38) |
2021-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {633097/1 Adopted |
2021-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-20 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB392 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 639
Subjects
Age
Committees and Commissions
Credit
Elderly Persons
Emergency Bills
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Poverty
Prices
Public Service Commission
Reports
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services - Generally
State Aid
Sunset
Termination of Services
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Committees and Commissions
Credit
Elderly Persons
Emergency Bills
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Poverty
Prices
Public Service Commission
Reports
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services - Generally
State Aid
Sunset
Termination of Services
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 5 | 5A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 5 | 5A-07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 4 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 4 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 512.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |