MD HB615 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the reporting and termination dates, to July 1, 2024, and June 30, 2025, respectively, for the Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, and Other Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals.
Title
Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, and Other Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals - Extension of Dates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392 |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2023-02-28 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-02-27 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-03 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Health Occupations
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Reports
studies
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Reports
studies
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment