MD HB627 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding vehicles used to provide demand response services to those vehicles that qualify for a specified motor fuel tax refund.
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Refund - Demand Response Trips
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522 |
2017-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {239434/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {585967/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Counties
Disabilities
Fuel Tax
Municipal Corporations
Taxes - Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Disabilities
Fuel Tax
Municipal Corporations
Taxes - Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous