MD HB627 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-06 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-06 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the West North Avenue Development Authority; exempting the Authority from certain provisions of State procurement law; and requiring the Authority to report by December 15, 2023, instead of October 1, 2023, its comprehensive neighborhood revitalization strategy, including any procurement activities undertaken by the Authority, to the Governor, the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, the House Health and Government Operations Committee, and the Appropriations Committee.
Title
Baltimore City - West North Avenue Development Authority - Membership and Procurement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2023-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {793028/1 Adopted |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-02-06 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-03 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB331 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Subjects
Baltimore City
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Economic Development
Emergency Bills
Health
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Safety
Sunset
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Economic Development
Emergency Bills
Health
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Safety
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 12 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 703.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 11 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |