MD HB642 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a home builder that agrees to provide a community amenity to a community development located in Prince George's County to include specified information in the contract of sale; specifying that a home builder that does not make the community amenity available as provided in the contract of sale may be liable for breach of contract; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Prince George's County - Real Property - Home Builders - Community Amenities
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-16 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-12 | Third Reading Passed (128-0) | |
2010-03-10 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-10 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Advertising
Civil Actions
Community Facilities and Services
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Contracts
Disclosure
Housing
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Prince George`s County
Real Property
Sports and Recreation
Civil Actions
Community Facilities and Services
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Contracts
Disclosure
Housing
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Prince George`s County
Real Property
Sports and Recreation