MD HB642 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing in Anne Arundel County a holder of a Class BLX license to be issued a music permit, an entertainment permit, an outdoor permit, or an outdoor entertainment permit; authorizing a holder of a Class BLX license to be issued a dancing permit, except under specified circumstances; exempting specified alcoholic beverages licenses in the county from a prohibition against issuing multiple licenses to any one person; exempting a Class BLX license from a prohibition against issuing an alcoholic beverages license for a specified location; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {443893/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Churches
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Zoning and Planning
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Churches
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Zoning and Planning