MD HB653 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Division of Library Development and Services in the Department of Education to establish the Deaf Culture Digital Library as the primary information center on deaf resources for library customers and staff in the State; and specifying the mission, duties, leadership, and responsibilities of the Deaf Culture Digital Library to include the formation of the Deaf Culture Digital Library Advisory Board to provide advice on initiatives that further advance the mission and goals of the Deaf Culture Digital Library.
Title
Education - Deaf Culture Digital Library
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606 |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {484932/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {515465/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Disabilities
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government
Libraries
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Disabilities
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government
Libraries
Telecommunications and Information Technology