MD HB655 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making a Class D (on- and off-sale) beer, wine, and liquor license part of specified groups of alcoholic beverages licenses that the Board of License Commissioners for Howard County may issue to an individual or for the use of a person.
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Licenses Ho. Co. 7-16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {573992/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Associations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Corporations
Franchises
Howard County
Interest
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Partnerships
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Associations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Corporations
Franchises
Howard County
Interest
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Partnerships
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes