MD HB676 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 299
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 299
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adding units of State government to the list of entities that are exempt from paying certain recording costs and other fees.
Title
Real Property - Recording Costs - Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 299 |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-03-03 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB291 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 300
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 3 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |