MD HB677 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting nonpublic institutions of higher education from making or enforcing rules subjecting students at the institution to disciplinary sanctions on the basis of conduct that is speech or other communication, as specified; authorizing a student to bring a civil enforcement action for relief in court, as specified; authorizing the court to award attorney's fees to a prevailing plaintiff under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Nonpublic Institutions of Higher Education - Free Speech
Sponsors
Del. Donald Dwyer [R] | Del. Donald Elliott [R] | Del. William Frank [R] | Del. Ronald George [R] |
Del. Jeannie Haddaway-Riccio [D] | Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Sen. Christopher Shank [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-04 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0677.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0677f.pdf |