MD HB677 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a custodian to deny inspection of a distribution list and a request to be added to a distribution list that identifies a physical address, an e-mail address, or a telephone number of an individual that is used by a governmental entity or an elected official for the sole purpose of periodically sending news about certain activities or sending informational notices or emergency alerts; etc.
Title
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone Numbers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-4) (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-4) (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39 |
2018-03-20 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-4) |
2018-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {316183/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Identification
Inspections
Notices
Postal Service
Privacy
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telephones
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Identification
Inspections
Notices
Postal Service
Privacy
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telephones