MD HB687 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the prohibition against the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene requiring the immunization of an individual under specified circumstances; and repealing the requirement that the Department adopt rules and regulations for religious exemptions under a specified provision of law.
Title
Public Health - Religious Exemptions from Immunization Requirements - Repeal
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] | Del. Will Campos [D] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Sen. Michael Jackson [D] |
Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2015-03-13 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Immunization
Minors
Public Health
Religion
Rules and Regulations
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Immunization
Minors
Public Health
Religion
Rules and Regulations