MD HB694 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-7)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-7)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the membership of employees of the Warrant Apprehension Unit in the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System; authorizing specified employees of the Warrant Apprehension Unit to transfer membership to the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System on or before December 31, 2015; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to transfer specified funds to the annuity savings fund of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System; etc.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Division of Parole and Probation - Warrant Apprehension Unit Employees - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268 |
2015-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2015-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {109434/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 8:30 a.m. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2015-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2015-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-12 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Law Enforcement
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement