MD HB71 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $949,102,501, the proceeds to be used for specified necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring specified real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to specified subdivisions and other organizations for specified development and improvement purposes, subject to specified matching fund requirements by specified dates; etc.
Title
Creation of State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011, and
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (DeGrange) Adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Floor Amendment (Smigiel) {803720/1 Rejected (Y: 41 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-31 - House - Floor Amendment (George) {143321/1 Rejected (Y: 45 N: 93 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-31 - House - Floor Amendment (Boteler) {253627/1 Rejected (Y: 43 N: 95 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-31 - House - Floor Amendment (McDermott) {613721/1 Rejected (Y: 42 N: 92 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (DeGrange) Adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Floor Amendment (Smigiel) {803720/1 Rejected (Y: 41 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-31 - House - Floor Amendment (George) {143321/1 Rejected (Y: 45 N: 93 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-31 - House - Floor Amendment (Boteler) {253627/1 Rejected (Y: 43 N: 95 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-31 - House - Floor Amendment (McDermott) {613721/1 Rejected (Y: 42 N: 92 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (42-4) | |
2011-04-07 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Peters, Colburn | |
2011-04-06 | Senate advisors: | |
2011-04-06 | DeGrange, Kasemeyer, McFadden, King, Edwards | |
2011-04-06 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (39-6) | |
2011-04-05 | Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Pugh) Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-6) | |
2011-04-04 | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted (47-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) Withdrawn | |
2011-04-04 | Special Order until later today (Senator Pugh) | |
2011-04-04 | Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Committee Amendment (#27-35) Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Committee Amendment (#17-26) Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Committee Amendment (#10-16) Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Committee Amendment (#2-9) Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-04-03 | Special Order until 4/8 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted | |
2011-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-04-02 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2011-04-07 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (98-41) | |
2011-04-08 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Gaines, Bohanan, Clagett g | |
2011-04-06 | House advisors: | |
2011-04-06 | Jones, Griffith, Proctor, Conway, Beitzel | |
2011-04-06 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-06 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2011-04-06 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | House consents Returned | |
2011-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (98-41) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-31 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Smigiel) Withdrawn | |
2011-03-31 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Smigiel) Rejected (41-97) | |
2011-03-31 | Floor Amendment (Delegate George) Rejected (45-93) | |
2011-03-31 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Boteler) Rejected (43-95) | |
2011-03-31 | Floor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) Rejected (42-92) | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Committee Amendment (#31-53) Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Committee Amendment (#30) Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Committee Amendment (#18-29) Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Committee Amendment (#18-30) | |
2011-03-31 | Committee Amendment (#8-17) Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Committee Amendment (#2-7) Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-30 | Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Jones) Adopted | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | |
2011-01-21 | First Reading Appropriations |