MD HB71 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting the Family Security Trust Fund, under specified circumstances, from a requirement that specified interest accrue to the General Fund; and requiring the State Treasurer, under specified circumstances, to pay investment earnings into the General Fund of the State.
Title
Family Security Trust Fund - Requirement to Transfer Interest to the General
Sponsors
Del. Dan Morhaim [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2012-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments 769330/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-21 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-31 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (128-11) | |
2012-03-31 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-07 | Third Reading Passed (131-8) | |
2012-02-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Favorable with Amendments 116585/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-16 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |