MD HB723 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Attorney General to seek injunctive relief on behalf of the State on the basis of an imminent or ongoing violation of certain rights of residents of certain health care facilities; requiring that the resident bill of rights for assisted living program residents include certain rights; and prohibiting the Attorney General from duplicating certain corrective action by the Maryland Department of Health.
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Rights of Residents of Health Care Facilities - Injunctive Relief
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141 |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-12) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-16) |
2024-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {803126/1 Adopted |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2024-01-29 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB863 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-17 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Assisted Living
Attorney General
Civil Rights and Social Equity
Courts
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Human Rights
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Vulnerable Adults
Attorney General
Civil Rights and Social Equity
Courts
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Human Rights
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Vulnerable Adults
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 1805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 1805.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 343 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 345.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |