MD HB726 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Apprenticeship and Training Council to include representation by individuals who are Black and Latino.
Title
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Representation
Sponsors
Del. Julian Ivey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB131 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Subjects
Apprentices
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Minorities
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Minorities
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 11 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |