MD HB726 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, unless the child's family requests that the child be removed, that a child on the registry for the Autism Waiver remain on the registry if the child's family relocates out of the State for military service; and providing that if a child on the registry for the Waiver becomes eligible for services while the child's family is out of the State for military service, the child shall be eligible for services through the Waiver if the family relocates to the State.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Autism Waiver - Military Families
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed 46-0 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620 |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed 46-0 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB231 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 151 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |