MD HB733 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Correcting specified cross-references to the Local Government Article in the Annotated Code of Maryland; correcting specified errors and omissions in and relating to the Local Government Article; clarifying the application of specified provisions; making specified conforming changes; deleting specified obsolete references; providing for the construction and effect of specified provisions of the Local Government Article; and making stylistic changes.
Title
Local Government - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsors
Del. The Speaker [?] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2013-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {120713/1 Report Adopted |
2013-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-05 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Chartered Counties
Code Counties
Corrective Legislation
Counties
Legislation
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Chartered Counties
Code Counties
Corrective Legislation
Counties
Legislation
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations