MD HB733 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the holder of multiple alcoholic beverage manufacturer's licenses to allow the sampling, sale, and consumption of products produced under the licenses at each of the licensed premises, subject to a specified restriction; repealing specified provisions of law that prohibit holders of specified manufacturer's licenses from selling or allowing to be consumed specified products; authorizing the holder of a farm brewery license to apply for and obtain, under a different name, additional licenses for specified premises; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Manufacturer's Licenses - Sampling, Sale, and Consumption of Products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Retail Sales