MD HB756 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of State to furnish a State flag to drape the casket of an eligible decedent; establishing the process for a State flag to be claimed after burial; providing that only one flag may be provided for the death of an eligible decedent; and prohibiting the Secretary of State from procuring a flag that is not wholly produced in the United States.
Title
General Provisions - State Flag - Casket of an Eligible Decedent
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481 |
2024-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {303320/1 Adopted |
2024-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB573 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Subjects
Death
Flags
Funerals
General Assembly
Governor
Judges
Rules and Regulations
Secretary of State
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Symbols
Flags
Funerals
General Assembly
Governor
Judges
Rules and Regulations
Secretary of State
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Symbols
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 7 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |