MD HB76 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a pharmacist to order and administer certain vaccinations to individuals in certain age groups if certain requirements are met; altering the vaccinations that a pharmacist can administer to individuals at least 3 years old; and altering the circumstances under which a pharmacist may administer certain vaccinations.
Title
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231 |
2024-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-10) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-36) |
2024-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {123327/1 Adopted |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-01-17 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2023-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB18 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Subjects
Age
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Federal Government
General Assembly
Health
Health Occupations
Immunization
Job Training
Licenses
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Federal Government
General Assembly
Health
Health Occupations
Immunization
Job Training
Licenses
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 12 | 508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |