MD HB769 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a local jurisdiction to adopt local amendments to the Maryland Building Performance Standards if the local amendments do not weaken wind design and wind-borne debris provisions contained in the Standards.
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Local Wind Design and Wind-Borne Debris Standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-3) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-3) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537 |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-3) |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-13 | House | Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate McDermott) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-06 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |