MD HB769 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council to be the Maryland Commission on Caregiving; altering the membership of the Commission to include specified members of the General Assembly; requiring the Governor, when appointing members, to consider groups representing specified individuals such as those with disabilities, disorders affecting an entire lifespan, and those who reflect the diversity of the State; requiring the Commission to provide ongoing analysis of best practices in family caregiver support programs; etc.
Title
Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and Duties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68 |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {246083/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Disabled
Elderly
General Assembly
Governor
Health
Home Care Services
Mental and Behavioral Health
Names
Respite Care
Disabled
Elderly
General Assembly
Governor
Health
Home Care Services
Mental and Behavioral Health
Names
Respite Care