MD HB777 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 322
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 322
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the days and hours of sale under a Class B wine shop and lounge license in Kent County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Kent County to issue a refillable container permit for draft beer to certain license holders; establishing an application process, hours of sale, and fees for the permit; requiring the Board to adopt certain regulations; authorizing the Board to issue a Class C multiple event beer, wine, and liquor license; etc.
Title
Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 322 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB792 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 323
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Fire Protection
Forms
Hearings
Inspections
Kent County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Signatures
Special Events
Storage
Time
Volunteers
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Fire Protection
Forms
Hearings
Inspections
Kent County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Signatures
Special Events
Storage
Time
Volunteers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 24 | 1003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 24 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 24 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 24 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 24 | 1309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 24 | 1310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |