MD HB792 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an inmate participating in specified home detention, work release, or pretrial release programs in Washington County to be responsible for costs of child support.
Title
Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child Support
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-06 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Home Detention
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prisoners
Public Safety
Support of Dependents
Washington County
Work, Labor and Employment
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prisoners
Public Safety
Support of Dependents
Washington County
Work, Labor and Employment