MD HB82 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the vessel draft for which an applicant for a limited pilotage license is required to possess sufficient ability, skill, and experience in piloting; increasing the vessel draft for which specified licensees are authorized to provide pilotage; and adjusting the types of licenses referenced in specified pilotage license fees to correspond to the increase in vessel draft allowances.
Title
State Board of Pilots - Limited Licenses
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-25 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-15 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-12 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | |
2010-02-10 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-10 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-01-13 | Hearing 1/21 at 10:30 a.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2009-10-08 | Pre-filed |