MD HB820 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Nuclear Energy Development Task Force to study and make recommendations on the deployment of nuclear power generation resources and other related technologies in the State and the establishment of a permanent nuclear energy commission in the State; and requiring the Task Force to report by December 30, 2025, on its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Title
Nuclear Energy Development Task Force
Sponsors
Del. Chao Wu [D] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Del. Wayne Hartman [R] |
Del. Terri Hill [D] | Del. Tom Hutchinson [R] | Del. Todd Morgan [R] | Del. Gary Simmons [D] |
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2024-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB805 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-06 - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Air Pollution
Awareness and Outreach
Committees and Commissions
Demographics
Energy
Energy Administration
Energy Matters
Environmental Justice
Environmental Matters
Industry and Technology
Minority Business Enterprises
Nuclear Matters
Power Plants
Public Officials
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
studies
Sunset
Awareness and Outreach
Committees and Commissions
Demographics
Energy
Energy Administration
Energy Matters
Environmental Justice
Environmental Matters
Industry and Technology
Minority Business Enterprises
Nuclear Matters
Power Plants
Public Officials
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
studies
Sunset