MD HB836 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the authority for a special wine tasting license to be issued to a Class B (on-off sale) beer, wine and liquor license holder in Washington County.
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Tasting License for Class B License Holders - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Washington County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Washington County