MD HB844 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $1,350,000 to $2,250,000 the maximum amount that the Maryland Small Business Development Financing Authority may guarantee a surety under the Small Business Surety Bond Program; and increasing from $1,000,000 to $2,500,000 the maximum amount of specified bonds that the Financing Authority may execute and perform as a surety under its surety program.
Title
Maryland Small Business Development Financing Authority - Small Business Surety Bond Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2015-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Bonds
Economic and Community Development
Privatization
Procurement
Small Business
Utilities
Bonds
Economic and Community Development
Privatization
Procurement
Small Business
Utilities