MD HB849 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB356
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a law enforcement agency to issue a warning for certain first violation on State highways enforced by school bus monitoring cameras; and requiring the State Highway Administration to develop a certain plan for improved safety measures at certain school bus stops in Montgomery County and to report its findings to certain persons on or before December 31, 2023.
Title
School Bus Stops - Violations - Enforcement and Safety Measures
Sponsors
Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D] | Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D] | Del. Jared Solomon [D] |
Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 110 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (110-25) |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB849 (Carry Over) 2023-03-22 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Citations
Highways
Law Enforcement
Montgomery County
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Notices
Recordings
Reports
Safety
School Buses
State Highway Administration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Highways
Law Enforcement
Montgomery County
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Notices
Recordings
Reports
Safety
School Buses
State Highway Administration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 706.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |